Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Grigore Maior, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Făgăraş (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1714¹BornSzeuka
25 Dec 174531.9Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
27 Oct 177258.8SelectedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
8 Mar 177359.1ConfirmedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
4 May 177359.3Ordained BishopBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
22 Sep 178369.7ResignedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
7 Feb 178571.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Grigore Maior:
Bishop Grigore Maior O.S.B.M. (born 1714, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Făgăraş

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016