Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Moyses Drágosi

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1726³BornTorda
28 Apr 175124.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jul 177649.9SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
23 Jun 177750.8ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
9 Nov 177751.1Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
16 Apr 178760.6DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Moyses Drágosi:
Bishop Moyses Drágosi (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino}

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 272
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015