Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Grigorij Chomyszyn (Khomyshyn)

Deceased

Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1867Born
18 Nov 189326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
6 May 190437.1AppointedBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
19 Jun 190437.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
28 Dec 194578.7DiedBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
27 Jun 2001Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Grigorij Chomyszyn (Khomyshyn) (VIAF: 163833689)
Bishop Bl. Grigorij Chomyszyn (Khomyshyn) (born , died ) Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHadynkivtsi
Death PlaceLukyaniv, Prison, Kyiv

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 30
  • opd/d: CB, 30 Jul 2017
  • dl: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 4 Nov 2017