Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Józef Teofil Teodorowicz

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1864BornZywaczów
26 Dec 188622.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Jan 188722.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 190137.2SelectedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
16 Dec 190137.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
2 Feb 190237.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
4 Dec 193874.4DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Józef Teofil Teodorowicz:
Archbishop Józef Teofil Teodorowicz (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1939
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 340
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013