Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Izaak Mikołaj Isakowicz

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1824Born
29 Jun 184824.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
6 Aug 184824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
19 Mar 188257.7SelectedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
3 Jul 188258.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
27 Aug 188258.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
29 Apr 190176.8DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Izaak Mikołaj Isakowicz (VIAF: 101996006)
Archbishop Izaak Mikołaj Isakowicz (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŁisiec, Archeparchy of Lviv (Armenian)
Ordained BishopLviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Armenian)

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • op/ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017