Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julian Pełesz

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1843Born
20 Oct 186724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
27 Mar 188542.2AppointedBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1 Nov 188542.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
22 Sep 189148.7AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
22 Apr 189653.3DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Julian Pełesz (VIAF: 89269995)
Bishop Julian Pełesz (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSmerekowiec
Ordained BishopSt. Georges, Lviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 527, and Page 470
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,661
  • c1: CB, 13 Feb 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Sep 2017