Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Spyrydon Lytvynovyč (Litwinowicz)

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1810BornUrmań
8 Apr 185746.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
8 Apr 185746.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Canatha
17 May 185746.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canatha
30 Jun 186352.6SelectedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
28 Sep 186352.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
4 Jun 186958.5DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Spyrydon Lytvynovyč (Litwinowicz):
Archbishop Spyrydon Lytvynovyč (Litwinowicz) (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 177, and Page 340

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Mar 2014