Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michał (Mykhaylo) Kuzemśki (Kuzemskyi)

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm and Bełz (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1809Born
3 Dec 183223.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Dec 183324.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 186858.5AppointedBishop of Chełm and Bełz (Ukrainian), Poland
23 Aug 186858.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm and Bełz (Ukrainian), Poland
5 Dec 187970.0DiedBishop of Chełm and Bełz (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Michał (Mykhaylo) Kuzemśki (Kuzemskyi) (VIAF: 301289117)
Bishop Michał (Mykhaylo) Kuzemśki (Kuzemskyi) (born , died ) Bishop of Chełm and Bełz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzybalin, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Ordained BishopRuthenian, Cathedral, Lviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 199
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,639
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 305
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Mar 2017