Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Grzegorz Michał Szymonowicz

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1800Born
8 Apr 185757.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
8 Apr 185757.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Marcopolis
5 Jul 185757.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Marcopolis
8 Dec 185858.7SucceededArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
14 Jun 187575.2DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Grzegorz Michał Szymonowicz (VIAF: 308742850)
Archbishop Grzegorz Michał Szymonowicz (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLviv, Archdiocese of Lviv
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lviv, Archdiocese of Lviv

  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 339, and Page 366
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Mar 2017