Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Siegmund Christoph von Schrattenbach

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1698Born
27 Dec 172224.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salzburg, Austria
10 Jan 172324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
5 Apr 175355.1SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
26 Sep 175355.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
21 Dec 175355.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
16 Dec 177173.8DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Siegmund Christoph von Schrattenbach
Archbishop Siegmund Christoph von Schrattenbach (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGraz

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1753, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 364

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018