Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist von Thurn Valsassina

Deceased

Bishop of Lavant, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1706Born
11 Jun 172922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
4 Feb 175447.4SelectedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
18 Apr 175447.6ConfirmedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
28 Apr 175447.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
3 Jun 176255.7DiedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist von Thurn Valsassina
Bishop Johann Baptist von Thurn Valsassina (born , died ) Bishop of Lavant

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKonstanz

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018