Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vigilius Augustin Maria von Firmian

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lavant


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1714BornTrento
173924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
26 May 174430.2SelectedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
3 Sep 174430.5ConfirmedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
4 Oct 174430.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
15 Jul 175339.4ResignedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
4 Aug 178874.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Lavant, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Vigilius Augustin Maria von Firmian:
Bishop Vigilius Augustin Maria von Firmian (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lavant

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe der Deutschsprachigen Lńnder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1744, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016