Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenz Joseph Franz Sales von Schrattenbach

Deceased

Bishop of Brno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1744BornBrno
15 Aug 176824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
31 May 177732.9AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
6 Jul 177733.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
29 Jan 179045.6ResignedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
25 Jun 179551.0SelectedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
26 Jul 179551.1ConfirmedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
4 Jun 180055.9SelectedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
11 Aug 180056.1ConfirmedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
11 Oct 180056.3InstalledBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
25 May 181671.9DiedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Vincenz Joseph Franz Sales von Schrattenbach:
Bishop Vincenz Joseph Franz Sales von Schrattenbach (born , died ) Bishop of Brno

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 120
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016