Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Christoph von Waldburg-Zeil

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1719Born
20 Sep 177253.6ConfirmedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
9 Jan 177454.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
9 Apr 178667.1DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Christoph von Waldburg-Zeil
Bishop Ferdinand Christoph von Waldburg-Zeil (born , died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1774, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 164
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,393

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast