Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonín Theodor Cardinal Colloredo von Wallsee und Mels

Deceased

Archbishop of Olomouc


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1729BornVienna, Austria
15 Aug 175829.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
20 Aug 175829.1Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
6 Oct 177748.2SelectedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
30 Mar 177848.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
17 May 177848.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
17 Jan 180373.5Elevated to Cardinal
12 Sep 181182.2DiedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Antonín Theodor Colloredo von Wallsee und Mels
Antonín Theodor Cardinal Colloredo von Wallsee und Mels (born , died ) Archbishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
  • a cardinal for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Jan 1803
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016