Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz de Paula Xaver Ludwig Jakob von Breuner

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1723BornGraz
27 Dec 175431.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
30 Sep 177350.3SelectedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
21 Dec 177350.5ConfirmedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
9 Jan 177450.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
1 May 177753.9ResignedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
15 Jun 178663.0AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
22 Apr 178763.9InstalledBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
1 Mar 179773.7DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz de Paula Xaver Ludwig Jakob von Breuner
Bishop Franz de Paula Xaver Ludwig Jakob von Breuner (born , died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1774, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 164, and Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016