Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Franz Joseph Engel von und zu Wagrain

Deceased

Bishop of Leoben


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1722BornFüssen, Germany
174320.8Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
20 Nov 178361.7SelectedBishop of Leoben, Austria
29 Apr 178664.2ConfirmedBishop of Leoben, Austria
30 Apr 178664.2Ordained BishopBishop of Leoben, Austria
22 Feb 180078.0DiedBishop of Leoben, Austria

MicroData Summary for Alexander Franz Joseph Engel von und zu Wagrain:
Bishop Alexander Franz Joseph Engel von und zu Wagrain (born , died ) Bishop of Leoben

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016