Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Philipp Franz von Spaur

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1718BornInnsbruck
1 Apr 174122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
6 Oct 176345.0AppointedBishop of Seckau, Austria
21 Dec 176345.2Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
26 May 177960.6SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
20 Mar 178061.4ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
26 May 179172.6DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Joseph Philipp Franz von Spaur:
Bishop Joseph Philipp Franz von Spaur (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe der Deutschsprachigen Lńnder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1763, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 131, and Page 371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 19 Dec 2015