Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Maria-Thaddäus Cardinal von Trauttmansdorf Wiensberg

Deceased

Archbishop of Olomouc


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1761BornGraz
14 Jun 178322.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Olomouc, Czech Republic
20 Dec 178322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
27 Sep 179433.3SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
1 Jun 179534.0ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
8 Sep 179534.2Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
26 Nov 181150.4SelectedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
15 Mar 181553.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
23 Sep 181655.3Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jan 181957.6DiedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Maria-Thaddäus von Trauttmansdorf Wiensberg
Maria-Thaddäus Cardinal von Trauttmansdorf Wiensberg (born , died ) Archbishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
  • a cardinal for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 291
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 356
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 23
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Sep 1816

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016