Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wenceslas Urban von Stuffler

Deceased

Bishop of Brno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1764³BornBrno
18 Dec 178824.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brno, Czech Republic
7 Mar 178924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Brno, Czech Republic
22 Nov 181652.2SelectedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
28 Jul 181752.8ConfirmedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
21 Sep 181753.0Ordained BishopBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
24 May 183166.7DiedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wenceslas Urban von Stuffler:
Bishop Wenceslas Urban von Stuffler (born , died ) Bishop of Brno

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013