Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alois Jozef Krakowski von Kolowrat

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1759³BornPraha
23 Dec 178021.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Jan 178122.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 180041.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
22 Dec 180041.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
1 Mar 180142.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
18 Feb 181253.1SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
15 Mar 181556.2ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
31 Aug 183071.6SelectedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
28 Feb 183172.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
28 Mar 183374.2DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alois Jozef Krakowski von Kolowrat:
Archbishop Alois Jozef Krakowski von Kolowrat (born , died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 314, and Page 320
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 335

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013