Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Bartolomej Hille

Deceased

Bishop of Litoměřice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1786BornVelkém Šenove
21 Apr 181023.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Apr 181023.4Ordained PriestPriest
31 Dec 183145.1SelectedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
2 Jul 183245.6ConfirmedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
16 Sep 183245.8Ordained BishopBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
26 Apr 186578.4DiedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Augustin Bartolomej Hille:
Bishop Augustin Bartolomej Hille (born , died ) Bishop of Litoměřice

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,465
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013