Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Dittrich

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

Titular Bishop of Corycus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1794BornMarschen
20 Aug 181824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
27 Feb 184651.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
20 Apr 184651.9AppointedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
10 May 184652.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corycus
5 Oct 185359.4DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Dittrich (VIAF: 169714499)
Bishop Josef Dittrich (born , died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 165
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1846, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Dec 2016