Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alois Josef Schrenk

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1802Born
8 Oct 182422.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 May 182523.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 183835.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
12 Feb 183835.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
25 Mar 183836.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
7 Aug 183836.3SelectedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
17 Sep 183836.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
4 Nov 183836.6InstalledArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
5 Mar 184946.9DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Alois Josef Schrenk (VIAF: 84327664)
Archbishop Alois Josef Schrenk (born , died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZbenic, Diocese of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Olomouc, Archdiocese of Olomouc
Death PlacePraha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 23.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 314, and Page 315
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 14
  • c34: CB, 23 Jul 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,474

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018