Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Ondřej Lindauer

Deceased

Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1784BornPilsen
19 Jul 180722.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
16 Aug 180722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
22 Sep 184560.8SelectedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
24 Nov 184560.9ConfirmedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
18 Jan 184661.1Ordained BishopBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
4 Jun 185065.5DiedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Josef Ondřej Lindauer (VIAF: 84334875)
Bishop Josef Ondřej Lindauer (born , died ) Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 120
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1846, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Dec 2016