Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Anton Gindl

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1786³BornRatten
8 Sep 180923.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Seckau, Austria
9 Sep 180923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Seckau, Austria
30 Sep 183145.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
30 Sep 183145.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
16 Nov 183145.2SelectedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
22 Jan 183245.4Ordained BishopBishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
2 Jul 183245.8ConfirmedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
23 Jan 184154.4SelectedBishop of Gurk, Austria
15 Aug 184154.9ConfirmedBishop of Gurk, Austria
24 Oct 184155.1DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Anton Gindl:
Bishop Franz Anton Gindl (born , died ) Bishop of Gurk

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 97, and Page 120
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013