Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonín Arnošt Schaaffgotsche

Deceased

Bishop of Brno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1804³BornBrno
2 Sep 182723.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Sep 182723.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 183935.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
11 Jul 183935.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
20 Oct 183935.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
18 Jul 184137.4SelectedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
27 Jan 184237.9ConfirmedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
31 Mar 187066.1DiedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonín Arnošt Schaaffgotsche:
Bishop Antonín Arnošt Schaaffgotsche (born , died ) Bishop of Brno

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 97, and Page 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013