Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roman Sebastian (Franz Xaver) Zšngerle, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Seckau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1771BornOberkirchberg
7 Feb 178918.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Dec 179322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
182149.9IncardinatedPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
24 Apr 182453.3SelectedBishop of Seckau, Austria
10 Sep 182453.6ConfirmedBishop of Seckau, Austria
12 Sep 182453.6Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
27 Apr 184877.3DiedBishop of Seckau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Roman Sebastian (Franz Xaver) Zšngerle:
Bishop Roman Sebastian (Franz Xaver) Zšngerle O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Seckau

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013