Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustin Johann Joseph Gruber

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1763³Born
2 Nov 178825.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
9 Nov 178825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
25 Jun 181552.0SelectedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
22 Jul 181653.0ConfirmedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
8 Sep 181653.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
16 Feb 182359.6SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
17 Nov 182360.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
25 Mar 182460.7InstalledArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
28 Jun 183572.0DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustin Johann Joseph Gruber
Archbishop Augustin Johann Joseph Gruber (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1816, Number 43
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 228, and Page 330

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018