Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Mayer

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1768Born
22 Aug 179022.1Ordained PriestPriest of Gurk, Austria
14 Dec 182759.4SelectedBishop of Gurk, Austria
19 Apr 182859.7ConfirmedBishop of Gurk, Austria
20 Apr 182859.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
22 Mar 184071.6DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Georg Mayer (VIAF: 232472325)
Bishop Georg Mayer (born , died ) Bishop of Gurk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTreffen
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 210
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1828, Number 18
  • c34: CB, 11 Oct 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,186

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018