Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Guglielmi

Deceased

Bishop of Verona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1805BornLissa
24 Sep 183934.1AppointedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
10 May 184034.7Ordained BishopBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
10 Aug 184034.9InstalledBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
26 May 185246.7SelectedBishop of Verona, Italy
27 Sep 185247.1ConfirmedBishop of Verona, Italy
29 Jan 185347.4DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Guglielmi (VIAF: 256087867)
Bishop Luigi Guglielmi (born , died ) Bishop of Verona

  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 587
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 338
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1840, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016