Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Viteri y Ungo

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1802Born
18 Feb 182623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Guatemala
27 Jan 184340.7AppointedBishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
29 Jan 184340.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
5 Nov 184947.5AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
25 Jul 185351.2DiedBishop of Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for José de Viteri y Ungo (VIAF: 16928925)
Bishop José de Viteri y Ungo (born , died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Salvador, Archdiocese of Guatemala, El Salvador
Ordained BishopTor de' Specchi (Oblates of St. Frances of Rome), Monastery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 27.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 411
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 331
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 3
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast