Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of San Salvador

Archidioecesis Sancti Salvatoris in America



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • José Luis Escobar Alas, Archbishop
  • Gregorio Rosa Chávez, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Fernando Sáenz Lacalle, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 February 1913
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: El Salvador
  • Square Kilometers: 3,295 (1,272 Square Miles)
  • Web Site: http://www.arzsansalvador.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Colonia Médica, Av. Dr. Emilio Alvarez y Av. Dr. Max Bloch, San Salvador, El Salvador
  • Telephone: 2234.5300
  • Fax: 2226.4979

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of San Salvador
28 September 1842ErectedArchdiocese of Guatemala Diocese of San Salvador (erected) (El Salvador)
11 February 1913Territory LostDiocese of San Salvador (San Miguel, La Union, Morazan, and Usulutan Provinces) Diocese of San Miguel (erected)
11 February 1913Territory LostDiocese of San Salvador (Ahuachapan, Santa Ana, and Sonsonate Provinces) Diocese of Santa Ana (erected)
Archdiocese of San Salvador
11 February 1913ElevatedDiocese of San Salvador (Cabanas, Chalatenanco, Cuscatlan, La Libertad, La Paz, San Salvador, and San Vicente Provinces) Archdiocese of San Salvador
18 December 1943Territory LostArchdiocese of San Salvador Diocese of San Vicente (erected)
30 December 1987Territory LostArchdiocese of San Salvador Diocese of Chalatenango (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of San Salvador
1950638,660643,82099.2%53721255,10912026444ap1951
1965981,277991,18899.0%711352064,76317540368ap1967
19701,022,0601,134,51190.1%1061452514,071188555121ap1971
19761,312,0301,543,56585.0%891402295,729198415104ap1977
19801,524,3031,732,16388.0%831101937,897162480110ap1981
19901,752,0001,947,00090.0%751252008,76025872097ap1991
19992,098,0002,998,00070.0%1161572737,6841277736135ap2000
20001,907,8512,779,00068.7%1221903126,1141318974138ap2001
20011,943,0913,273,00059.4%1341903245,9971318974137ap2002
20021,907,8512,725,50270.0%1371933305,7811343987138ap2003
20031,907,8512,725,50570.0%1371933305,7811343987137ap2004
20041,907,8512,725,50270.0%1371933305,7811275987137ap2005
20102,273,0303,071,65474.0%1461963426,64613091,128150ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 17 Apr 2013