Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop JosÚ Luis Escobar Alas

Archbishop of San Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1959 BornSan Salvador
15 Aug 198223.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Vicente, El Salvador
19 Jan 200242.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Vicente, El Salvador
19 Jan 200242.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibica
23 Mar 200243.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibica
4 Jun 200546.2AppointedBishop of San Vicente, El Salvador
9 Jul 200546.3InstalledBishop of San Vicente, El Salvador
27 Dec 200849.8AppointedArchbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
14 Feb 200949.9InstalledArchbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for JosÚ Luis Escobar Alas:
Archbishop JosÚ Luis Escobar Alas (born ) Archbishop of San Salvador

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of San Salvador.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,154

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013