Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Oscar Barahona Castillo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Vicente, El Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1938Born
20 Jan 196324.1Ordained PriestPriest of San Vicente, El Salvador
16 Jul 198243.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Vicente, El Salvador
16 Jul 198243.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mibiarca
9 Oct 198243.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mibiarca
6 Jun 198344.5AppointedBishop of San Vicente, El Salvador
4 Jun 200566.5RetiredBishop of San Vicente, El Salvador
22 Oct 201677.8DiedBishop Emeritus of San Vicente, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for José Oscar Barahona Castillo
Bishop José Oscar Barahona Castillo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Vicente

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMercedes La Ceiba

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 22 Oct 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast