Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabio Reynaldo Colindres Abarca

Bishop of San Miguel, El Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1961 Born
6 Apr 198725.7Ordained PriestPriest of San Vicente, El Salvador
12 Nov 200342.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of El Salvador, Military
2 Feb 200846.6AppointedBishop of El Salvador, Military
29 Mar 200846.7Ordained BishopBishop of El Salvador, Military
8 Oct 201150.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sonsonate, El Salvador
4 Aug 201251.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Sonsonate, El Salvador
7 Dec 201756.4AppointedBishop of San Miguel, El Salvador
7 Apr 201856.7InstalledBishop of San Miguel, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Fabio Reynaldo Colindres Abarca
Bishop Fabio Reynaldo Colindres Abarca (born ) Bishop of San Miguel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIlobasco, Diocese of San Vicente
Ordained BishopMaría Auxiliadora (Don Rúa), Church, San Salvador, Archdiocese of San Salvador

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Miguel.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,697
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2017
  • i: CB, 9 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast