Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodrigo Orlando Cabrera Cuéllar

Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de María


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1938 BornTeotepeque
6 Jan 196223.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 198345.7AppointedBishop of Santiago de María, El Salvador
11 Feb 198445.9Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de María, El Salvador
4 Jan 201677.8RetiredBishop of Santiago de María, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo Orlando Cabrera Cuéllar
Bishop Rodrigo Orlando Cabrera Cuéllar (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de María

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santiago de María.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016