Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Nancy (-Toul)

Dioecesis Nanceiensis (-Tullensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • United: 20 February 1824
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Besançon
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 5,275 (2,037 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Est
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-nancy.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: 6 rue Girardet, B.P. 40260, 54005 Nancy CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 3.83.17.26.26
  • Fax: 3.83.17.26.36

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Nancy
19 November 1777ErectedDiocese of Nancy (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Saint-Dié (suppressed) Diocese of Nancy
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Verdun (suppressed) Diocese of Nancy
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Nancy Diocese of Saint-Dié
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Nancy Diocese of Verdun
Diocese of Nancy (-Toul)
20 February 1824UnitedDiocese of Nancy
Diocese of Toul
Diocese of Nancy (-Toul)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Nancy (-Toul)
1970650,000705,41392.1%624756999291071,279660ap1971
1980669,000731,00091.5%540606001,115109961644ap1981
1990662,000726,00091.2%452354871,359261795646ap1991
1999673,000736,00091.4%338313691,8231236605356ap2000
2000662,130712,74292.9%334403741,7701242580358ap2001
2001652,130712,74291.5%321393601,8111140543241ap2002
2002652,130713,77991.4%304283321,9641330535211ap2003
2003653,000713,55591.5%305293341,9551831502211ap2004
2004655,000713,77991.8%278383162,0721840500211ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 1 Jun 2013