Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Joseph-Eugène Ruch

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1873Born
11 Jul 189723.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 191339.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
14 Jun 191339.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gerasa
16 Jul 191339.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gerasa
20 Oct 191845.0SucceededBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
23 Apr 191945.5SelectedBishop of Strasbourg, France
1 Aug 191945.8ConfirmedBishop of Strasbourg, France
30 Sep 191946.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nancy (-Toul), France
13 Oct 191946.0InstalledBishop of Strasbourg, France
11 Feb 192046.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Nancy (-Toul), France
29 Aug 194571.9DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary
Charles-Joseph-Eugène Ruch
Bishop Charles-Joseph-Eugène Ruch
(born , died )
Bishop of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNancy

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1913, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 66
  • aadm: Acta Apostolicæ Sedis, Volume 11, Page 415

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 24 May 2025