Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmond Vansteenberghe

Deceased

Bishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1881Born
2 Jul 190423.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 193958.4AppointedBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
10 Dec 193958.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
10 Dec 194362.6DiedBishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France

MicroData Summary for Edmond Vansteenberghe
Bishop Edmond Vansteenberghe (born , died ) Bishop of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWinnezeele

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018