Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marie Théas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tarbes et Lourdes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1894BornBarzun
26 Sep 192026.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jul 194045.9AppointedBishop of Montauban, France
3 Oct 194046.1Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
17 Feb 194752.4AppointedBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
12 Feb 197075.4RetiredBishop of Tarbes et Lourdes, France
12 Feb 197075.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sanctus Germanus
10 Dec 197076.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Sanctus Germanus
3 Apr 197782.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarbes et Lourdes, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie Théas:
Bishop Pierre-Marie Théas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarbes et Lourdes

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013