Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tarbes et Lourdes

Dioecesis Tarbiensis et Lourdensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Tarbes
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Tarbes (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Tarbes (suppressed) Diocese of Agen
Diocese of Bayonne
Diocese of Tarbes
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Bayonne Diocese of Tarbes
Diocese of Tarbes et Lourdes
20 April 1912Name ChangedDiocese of Tarbes Diocese of Tarbes et Lourdes
Diocese of Tarbes et Lourdes
14 January 1913Name ChangedDiocese of Tarbes et Lourdes Diocese of Tarbes et Lourdes
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Tarbes et Lourdes (from Auch)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tarbes et Lourdes
1950201,000201,95499.5%3255237753365626488ap1951
1969180,000225,73079.7%2754431956474965156ap1971
1978170,000229,00074.2%2394228160472865522ap1981
1990200,000233,00085.8%18066246813399764522ap1991
1999150,000225,00066.7%14749196765689674105ap2000
2000150,000222,36567.5%12452176852792675117ap2001
2001140,000222,36563.0%13853191732893700117ap2002
2002150,000222,40067.4%125521778471092700117ap2003
2003150,000222,40067.4%126561828241078650117ap2204
2004150,000222,40067.4%126531798371075645117ap2005
2010151,000229,00065.9%106621688981498422525ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 Aug 2014