Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Clément de Poudenx

Deceased

Bishop of Tarbes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1642¹BornPoudenx, Landes
28 Mar 167129.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jan 167836.0SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
24 Mar 169250.2ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
24 Aug 169250.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
24 Jun 171674.4DiedBishop of Tarbes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Clément de Poudenx:
Bishop François-Clément de Poudenx (born 1642, died ) Bishop of Tarbes

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 368
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015