Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Baptiste-Armand Bazin de Bezons

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1654BornMontpellier
15 Aug 168530.6SelectedBishop of Aire, France
12 Oct 169338.7ConfirmedBishop of Aire, France
22 Nov 169338.8Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
29 Mar 169843.2SelectedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
15 Sep 169843.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
4 May 171964.3SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
18 Sep 171964.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
8 Oct 172166.7DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Armand Bazin de Bezons:
Archbishop Jean-Baptiste-Armand Bazin de Bezons (born , died ) Archbishop of Rouen

  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 147
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 70, and Page 130
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 336
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015