Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-César Le Blanc, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Avranches, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1672Born
20 Mar 172048.0ConfirmedBishop of Avranches, France
1 May 172048.1Ordained BishopBishop of Avranches, France
13 Mar 174673.9DiedBishop of Avranches, France

MicroData Summary for François-César Le Blanc
Bishop François-César Le Blanc C.R.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Avranches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018