Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léonor III de Goyon de Matignon

Deceased

Bishop of Coutances, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1683¹Born
8 Jan 172138.0SelectedBishop of Coutances, France
1 Dec 172138.9ConfirmedBishop of Coutances, France
11 Jan 172239.0Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
29 Mar 175774.2DiedBishop of Coutances, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Léonor III de Goyon de Matignon
Bishop Léonor III de Goyon de Matignon (born 1683, died ) Bishop of Coutances

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorigni-sur-Vire

  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Feb 2017