Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique-Barnabé Turgot de Saint-Clair

Deceased

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1667Born
12 Jul 171042.7SelectedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
10 Nov 171043.0ConfirmedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
14 Dec 171043.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
18 Dec 172760.1DiedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

MicroData Summary for Dominique-Barnabé Turgot de Saint-Clair
Bishop Dominique-Barnabé Turgot de Saint-Clair (born , died ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 338
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast