Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Honoré-François Grimaldi de Monaco

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Besançon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1669BornParis
169929.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Oct 172353.8SelectedArchbishop of Besançon, France
20 Nov 172454.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Besançon, France
4 Feb 172555.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Besançon, France
1 Mar 173262.1ResignedArchbishop of Besançon, France
16 May 174878.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Honoré-François Grimaldi de Monaco:
Archbishop Honoré-François Grimaldi de Monaco (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Besançon

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 120
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015