Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Louis de Froullay de Tessé

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1687Born
17 Oct 172336.0SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
12 Jan 172436.3ConfirmedBishop of Le Mans, France
25 Feb 172436.4Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
31 Jan 176779.3DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Louis de Froullay de Tessé
Bishop Charles-Louis de Froullay de Tessé (born , died ) Bishop of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Denis de Gastines

  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 154
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Feb 2017