Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Wilhelm Egon Cardinal von Fürstenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1629BornHeiligenberg, Germany
8 Jun 168252.5SelectedBishop of Strasbourg, France
11 Jan 168353.1ConfirmedBishop of Strasbourg, France
1 May 168353.4Ordained BishopBishop of Strasbourg, France
2 Sep 168656.7Elevated to Cardinal
14 Nov 168959.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
9 Apr 1704³74.3DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Egon von Fürstenberg:
Wilhelm Egon Cardinal von Fürstenberg (born , died ) Bishop of Strasbourg

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
  • a cardinal for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 6
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015